IL SB1612 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that various petitions and filings must be filed with the county clerk or the county board of election commissioners, as the case may be, of the county in which the principal office of the community college board is located, rather than the secretary of the board of trustees. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMM COLL-ELECTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-7.10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback