IL SB1610 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Preventing Sexual Violence in Higher Education Act. Requires each higher education institution to annually conduct a sexual misconduct climate survey of all students at the institution. Provides that each institution's sexual misconduct climate survey shall include the Board of Higher Education's base survey. Requires each institution to compile a summary of the results of the sexual misconduct climate survey and submit the summary to the Board, as well as publish the summary on the institution's website. Creates the Task Force on Campus Sexual Misconduct Climate Surveys to develop and recommend to the Board the base survey for distribution to institutions and to provide the Board with any related recommendations regarding the content, timing, and application of the base survey. Sets forth other requirements concerning the Task Force and the sexual misconduct climate survey. Includes penalty provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHR ED-SEXUAL VIOLENCE-SURVY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0325 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |