IL SB1608 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Repeals provisions establishing the Illinois Science and Technology Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMALL BUSINESS INNOVATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
2019-03-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1000Repealed CodeCitation Text
207002003Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback