IL SB1604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that if a physician or other authorized prescriber does not prohibit drug product substitution, a pharmacist shall dispense a brand name drug product as a substitute for an unavailable nonbrand name drug product specified in the prescription. Provides that if the substitute drug product has a unit price greater than the unavailable drug product specified in the prescription, then the pharmacist shall dispense that substitute drug product at the lesser unit price of the drug product specified in the prescription. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to extend the repeal date for the Pharmacy Practice Act to January 1, 2020. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY-PRESCRIPTION DRUGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258525Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback