IL SB1604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that if a physician or other authorized prescriber does not prohibit drug product substitution, a pharmacist shall dispense a brand name drug product as a substitute for an unavailable nonbrand name drug product specified in the prescription. Provides that if the substitute drug product has a unit price greater than the unavailable drug product specified in the prescription, then the pharmacist shall dispense that substitute drug product at the lesser unit price of the drug product specified in the prescription. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to extend the repeal date for the Pharmacy Practice Act to January 1, 2020. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PHARMACY-PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 85 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1604&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1604.htm |