IL SB1602 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Changes the definition of "community-based manufactured home dealer" to include a person who buys a new manufactured home or park model that is located within the manufactured home community pursuant to a franchise agreement or similar agreement with a manufacturer, or a used manufactured home or park model located within the manufactured home community, with either the new or used manufactured home also able to be located in a different manufactured home community that is owned or managed by the community-based manufactured home dealer. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-MOBILE HOME DEALERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0407 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 5-101.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |