IL SB1601 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the required history of the United States course, provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the course must also include instruction on the history of Illinois.
Title
SCH CD-IL HISTORY INSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0341 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-042-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-008-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |