IL SB1598 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an insurer may not use a person's ZIP code in underwriting or rating automobile insurance, including the determination of premium rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-ZIP CODE DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-06SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2019-03-05SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143.24eNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback