IL SB1598 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the valuation procedures for PPV leases sunsets on January 1, 2056 (currently, January 1, 2016). Provides that the definition of "net operating income" is the same for naval training facilities as it is for other military training facilities. Makes changes concerning the calculation of the fair cash value of a PPV Lease. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-PPV LEASES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-008-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-045-001
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520010-365Amended CodeCitation Text
3520010-370Amended CodeCitation Text
3520010-375Amended CodeCitation Text
3520010-380Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1598&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1598ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1598_04272017_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1598_05302017_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1598_05312017_097000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback