IL SB1597 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 83-841. Directs the Department of Central Management Services to execute and record a release of the reverter clause contained in a quitclaim deed concerning certain land in Kankakee County. Effective immediately.
Title
MANTENO-RELEASE LAND INTEREST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0607 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Effective Date December 13, 2019 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-11-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-10-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-009-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-10-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |