IL SB1596 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Worker's Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that specified Sections limiting recovery do not apply to injuries or death resulting from an occupational disease as to which the recovery of compensation benefits under the Act would be precluded due to the operation of any period of repose or repose provision. Provides that, as to any such injury occupational disease, the employee, the employee's heirs, and any person having the standing under law to bring a civil action at law has the nonwaivable right to bring such an action against any employer or employers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKERS' COMPENSATION REPOSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0006
2019-05-17SenateEffective Date May 17, 2019
2019-05-17SenateGovernor Approved
2019-03-20SenateSent to the Governor
2019-03-14SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-040-001
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseJudicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-13HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-004-001
2019-03-13HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-13HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-12HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-03-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-12HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-03-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-12HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-03-11HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-03-11HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-03-11HousePension Note Filed
2019-03-11HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-03-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-08HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-08HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-07HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-06HouseArrived in House
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-016-001
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-002-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203051.2New CodeSee Bill Text
82030511Amended CodeCitation Text
8203055Amended CodeCitation Text
8203101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
82031011Amended CodeCitation Text
8203105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback