IL SB1596 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure in relation to forcible entry and detainer actions. In connection with service of process on an unknown occupant and the ability of law enforcement officials to remove persons or property from the premises when there is a criminal trespass, provides that any person asserting a right to possession of the premises must produce evidence to law enforcement officials that he or she is in legal possession. Provides that this evidence may include a lease agreement, receipts for payment of rent, or other documentation that demonstrates that the person claiming a right to possession does so with the knowledge and consent of the property owner.
Title
CIV PRO-FORCBLE ENTRY-OCCUPANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-03-05 | Held in Judiciary | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1596&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1596.htm |