IL SB1593 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a Youth Training and Education in the Building Trades Program to award grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of establishing training programs for youth with an interest in the building trades. Provides that under the training programs, each youth shall receive: (1) formal training and education in the fundamentals and core competencies in the youth's chosen trade; and (2) hands-on experience in the building trades by participating in community improvement projects involving the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential property. Requires selected organizations to use the grant money to establish an entrepreneurship program to provide eligible youth with the capital and business management skills necessary to launch their own businesses. Contains provisions concerning residential property that is eligible for acquisition under the Program; the selection criteria for community-based organizations; and the Youth Training and Education in the Building Trades Fund. Amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. Requires the Illinois Housing Development Authority to establish a Training Youth in the Building Trades Program that is substantially similar to the Youth Training and Education in the Building Trades Program. Contains provisions concerning residential property that is eligible for acquisition under the Program; the selection criteria for community-based organizations; and the Training Youth in the Building Trades Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Youth Training and Education in the Building Trades Fund and the Training Youth in the Building Trades Fund. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-BUILDING TRADES PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20130510-48New CodeSee Bill Text
2038057.32New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.892New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback