IL SB1591 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Defines as a prohibited political activity the wearing or displaying of items expressing support for or against a candidate or referendum question while registering voters as a deputy registrar or assisting persons in completing mail-in voter registration applications. Defines a "candidate" to include candidates for federal and local offices as well as State offices.
Title
ST ETHICS VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-03-31 | Third Reading - Passed; 042-001-007 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Elections; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Held in Elections | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Elections | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Elections | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Elections | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-05 | Postponed - Elections | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Elections | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |