IL SB1590 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Provides that all individual and small group accident and health policies written subject to certain federal standards must file rates with the Department of Insurance for approval. Provides that unreasonable rate increases or inadequate rates shall be disapproved. Requires the Department to provide a report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2023 regarding both on and off exchange individual and small group rates in the Illinois market. Requires that the Department approve or deny rate filings within 45 calendar days of submission unless the Director of Insurance extends the period by following specific procedures. Provides that a rate increase that is not approved or denied by the Department by the applicable deadline shall be automatically approved on the following calendar day. Provides that no less than 30 days after the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services has certified the plans described in this Section for the upcoming plan year, the Department shall publish on its website a report explaining the rates for that plan year's certified health care plans. Defines "inadequate rate" and "unreasonable rate increase". Effective immediately.
Title
INS-HEALTH CARE RATE CHANGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Insurance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 4-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1590&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1590.htm |