IL SB1587 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Freedom from Drone Surveillance Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency may not use a drone to gather information. Permits the use of a drone by a law enforcement agency: (1) to counter a high risk of a terrorist attack by a specific individual or organization if the United States Secretary of Homeland Security determines that credible intelligence indicates that there is that risk; (2) if a law enforcement agency first obtains a search warrant signed by a judge authorizing the use of a drone; or (3) if a law enforcement agency possesses reasonable suspicion that, under particular circumstances, swift action is needed to prevent imminent harm to life or serious damage to property, or to forestall the imminent escape of a suspect or the destruction of evidence. Provides that a law enforcement agency may not own or use a drone that is equipped with any kind of lethal or non-lethal weapon. Provides that information obtained or collected in violation of the Act is not admissible as evidence in any criminal, civil, administrative, or other proceeding. Establishes certain information retention and reporting requirements concerning drone ownership and use.
Title
DRONE SURVEILLANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0569 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 105-012-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-05-30 | House | Chair placed on Standard Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 014-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-002-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |