IL SB1585 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987 from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Reorganizes the Act by adding titles and renumbering provisions. Replaces references to "supervising physicians" with references to "collaborating physicians" throughout the Act. Replaces references to "supervision agreement" with references to "collaborative agreement" throughout the Act. Adds provisions concerning continuing education. In provisions concerning grounds for disciplinary action, provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may refuse to issue or renew a physician assistant license or discipline a licensee for willfully or negligently violating a patient's confidentiality, except as required by law, or failing to provide copies of medical records as required by law. Amends various Acts to conform references and terminology. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0453 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |