IL SB1584 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. For school years beginning on or after July 1, 2019, increases to 120 days (instead of 100 days) the amount of days a service retirement pensioner who is re-employed as a teacher may work without having his or her pension cancelled. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHI TCH-RETURN TO WORK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0340
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-016-000
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-13HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 009-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40517-149Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback