IL SB1581 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In provisions concerning authorized fines, provides that an additional penalty is imposed in sentencing for an offense concerning vehicle wheel and axle loads and gross weights of $15 for each $40 of the first $330, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed for a violation and $10 for each subsequent $40, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed for a violation following the initial $15 surcharge for each $40 of the first $330 of fine imposed (rather than an additional penalty of $15 for each $40, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-VEH WHEEL LOADS-FINES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback