IL SB1580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes provisions providing that a written motor vehicle accident report is privileged as to the Secretary of State and the Department of Transportation and shall be held confidential. Provides that the Department may provide for in-depth investigations of accidents involving Department employees or other motor vehicle accidents (rather than investigations of only motor vehicle accidents) by individuals or special investigation groups. Provides that an accident report required to be made in writing shall be made on an approved (rather than appropriate) form or in an approved electronic format provided by the Administrator. Provides that upon written request, the Department shall furnish copies of a written accident report or any supplemental reports to a federal, State, or local agency that is engaged in highway safety research and study and to any person or entity that has a contractual relationship with the Department or a federal, State, or local agency to complete a highway safety research and study for the Department or the federal, State, or local agency. Provides that upon written request, the Department shall furnish motor vehicle accident data to a federal, State, or local agency, the Secretary of State, the Illinois Commerce Commission, or any other person or entity that has a contractual agreement with the Department or a federal, State, or local agency to complete a highway safety research and study for the Department or the federal, State, or local agency. Defines "motor vehicle accident data". Makes conforming changes. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to exempt from inspection and copying information contained in motor vehicle accident reports and supplemental reports under Article IV of Chapter 11 of the Illinois Vehicle Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-ACCIDENT REPORT & DATA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Anderson
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62551-146.5New CodeSee Bill Text
625511-408Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-411Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-412Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-414Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-417New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback