IL SB1576 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Guardians for Adults with Disabilities Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the required report that is attached to a petition for adjudication of disability and for appointment of a guardian may contain a psychological and mental capacity evaluation of the respondent that has been performed by a licensed clinical psychologist within 3 months of the date of the filing of the petition. Makes a corresponding change. Provides that the court may enter an order authorizing the ward to execute a will or codicil upon the request of the ward that is accompanied by a current licensed clinical psychologist's (as an alternative to a physician's) report that states the ward possesses testamentary capacity. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADULT GUARDIAN-MEDICAL REPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755511a-18Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback