IL SB1573 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes technical changes to specify in provisions concerning provisional eligibility for long-term care services that: (i) the Department of Healthcare and Family Services must maintain the applicant's provisional Medicaid enrollment status until a final eligibility determination is approved or the applicant's appeal has been adjudicated and eligibility is denied; (ii) the Department of Healthcare and Family Services or the managed care organization, if applicable, must reimburse providers for services rendered during an applicant's provisional eligibility period; (iii) the Department of Healthcare and Family Services must submit payment vouchers for all retroactive reimbursement due to the Office of the Comptroller within 10 business days of issuing provisional eligibility to an applicant; and (iv) the Department of Healthcare and Family Services must adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-MEDICAID-LONG TERM CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0559
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2019-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-13HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305511-5.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1573&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1573.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1573eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1573enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0559.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1573ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1573ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1573_03132019_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1573_05302019_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1573ham002_05312019_061001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1573ham001_05312019_061000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback