IL SB1573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision limiting medical assistance recipients to one pair of adult eyeglasses every 2 years, provides that the limitation does not apply to an individual who needs different eyeglasses following a surgical procedure such as cataract surgery. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-CONTRACTS-MANAGED CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-12SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0580
2018-03-12SenateEffective Date March 12, 2018
2018-03-12SenateGovernor Approved
2018-02-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-02-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-02-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-02-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-001
2018-02-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - February 28, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-02-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-02-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2018-02-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-02-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-01-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-24HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-001
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5fAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1573&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1573.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1573eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1573enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0580.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1573ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1573ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1573_04272017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1573_02282018_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1573ham002_02282018_003001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1573ham001_02282018_003000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback