IL SB1573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision limiting medical assistance recipients to one pair of adult eyeglasses every 2 years, provides that the limitation does not apply to an individual who needs different eyeglasses following a surgical procedure such as cataract surgery. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-CONTRACTS-MANAGED CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0580 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Effective Date March 12, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-001 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-01-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-001 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5f | Amended Code | Citation Text |