IL SB1567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that each taxpayer claiming a credit under the Act shall, no later than April 15 of each taxable year for which the taxpayer claims a credit, submit to the Illinois Commerce Commission an annual report containing certain information concerning procurement goals and spending for female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises. Provides that the reports shall be submitted in the form and manner required by the Illinois Commerce Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDGE-REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0451
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35105-57New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback