IL SB1565 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, on or after July 1, 2017 and on or before December 31, 2018, the taxes imposed under the Acts apply to 90% of the proceeds of sales of gasohol and 80% of the proceeds of sales of mid-range ethanol blends. Amends the Illinois Renewable Fuels Development Program Act. Provides that grants may be awarded for the following programs: a next generation renewable fuels program, a majority blended ethanol and blender pump infrastructure program, and a research and development program for sustainable corn production and corn-based renewable fuel production. Sets forth the maximum aggregate amount of grants that may be awarded under each program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TX-GASOHOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-29SenateRe-assigned to Revenue
2017-03-29SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2068915Amended CodeCitation Text
2068920Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-40Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-44Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-44.3New CodeSee Bill Text
351103-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback