IL SB1562 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abandoned Housing Rehabilitation Act. In a provision concerning a court hearing on an organization's petition for temporary possession of property that the organization intends to rehabilitate, requires the organization to demonstrate to the court that: (i) its rehabilitation plan has been approved by the governing body of the municipality within which the property is located or, if the property is located within an unincorporated area, the county board or board of commissioners of the county within which the property is located; and (ii) any plan commission or planning department of the municipality or county within which the property is located has provided input and advice prior to the municipality's or county's approval of the rehabilitation plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABANDONED HOUSING-REHAB-TERMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
310504Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback