IL SB1561 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for a third-party loan modification service provider, because of unlawful discrimination, familial status, or an arrest record, to (1) refuse to engage in loan modification services or to discriminate in making such services available, or (2) alter the terms, conditions, or privileges of such services. Makes changes concerning what constitutes retaliation under various Articles of the Act. Provides that, in proceedings relating to real estate transactions, the failure of the Department to notify the complainant or respondent in writing of the reasons for not completing an investigation on the allegations set forth in a charge within 100 days shall not deprive the Department of jurisdiction over the charge. Makes corresponding and other changes.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS ACT-HOUSING
Sponsors
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0362 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-019-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Immigration & Human Rights Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 3-102.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
775 | 5 | 5A-101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 6-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 6-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
775 | 5 | 7A-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 7B-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 7B-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 8A-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 8B-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |