IL SB1559 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning payment rates for nursing facilities, provides that facility-specific staffing levels and wages paid (rather than regional wage adjusters based on the Health Service Areas (HSA) groupings and adjusters in effect on April 30, 2012) shall be one of the factors in determining the new nursing services reimbursement methodology utilizing the RUG-IV 48 grouper model. Sets forth the calculation of the facility-specific RUG-IV nursing component per diem rate for dates of service beginning July 1, 2017. Provides that certain staffing and wage adjusters must be updated each quarter using the staffing hours and wage data from Payroll Benefit Journal data collected by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for the same time period of Minimum Date Set data used to calculate the RUG-IV acuity case weight. Sets forth how to calculate each facility's "total per resident per day staffing wage cost". Provides that the levels used to assign certain staffing and wage adjusters shall be calculated using the staffing ratios required under the Nursing Home Care Act multiplied by the Illinois mean hourly wage for the equivalent occupational code and title assigned by the U.S. Bureau of Labor Statistics and reported in the May 2014 State Occupational Employment and Wage Estimates for Illinois. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017 and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may adjust, by administrative rule and within certain parameters established under the Code, a specific staffing and wage adjuster described in the Code for the purpose of keeping liability created by the facility-specific RUG-IV nursing component per diem rates stable. Permits the Department to adopt rules to implement these provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-PAYMENT RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-29SenateTo Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback