IL SB1558 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board shall submit recommendations for a model program of study, for credit, that incorporates the training and experience necessary to serve as a direct support professional to the Department of Human Services. Provides that the model program of study shall be developed in consultation with stakeholders, including, but not limited to, organizations representing community-based providers serving children and adults with intellectual or developmental disabilities, and elementary and secondary education practitioners, including, but not limited to, teachers, administrators, special education directors, and regional superintendents of schools. Provides that beginning with the 2026-2027 academic year and continuing for not less than 2 academic years, the Illinois Community College Board shall make available to community colleges the model program of study developed by the Illinois Community College Board.
Title
HIGHER ED-DIRECT SUPPORT PROF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0092 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-03-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-03-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |