IL SB1557 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that early childhood programs receiving State Board of Education grants for preschool educational programs shall prohibit the expulsion of children. Provides instead that when persistent and serious challenging behaviors emerge, the early childhood program shall document steps taken to ensure that the child can participate safely in the program and utilize a range of community resources. Sets forth provisions concerning the creation of a transition plan if there is documented evidence that all available interventions and supports recommended by a qualified professional have been exhausted; temporary removal of a child; the utilization of training, technical support, and professional development resources; and annually reporting to the State Board. Makes related changes. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969 to require the Department of Children and Family Services, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Early Childhood Development and the State Board of Education, to adopt rules prohibiting the use of expulsion due to a child's persistent and serious challenging behaviors in licensed day care centers, day care homes, and group day care homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY CHILDHOOD PROGRAM-EXPEL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.71Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.71aAmended CodeCitation Text
225105.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback