IL SB1545 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a repossessed vehicle, fleet vehicle, or flood vehicle that has been damaged in excess of 50% (instead of 33 1/3%) of its fair market value shall be considered to be salvage. Provides that a flood vehicle that has sustained damage greater than 50% (rather than 33 1/3%) of its fair market value with that damage shall be required to complete a successful inspection before being issued a new certificate of title.
Title
VEH CD-SALVAGE CERTIFICATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0319 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-117.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |