IL SB1544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires long term care facilities to submit admission documents through the Medical Electronic Data Interchange (MEDI) or the Recipient Eligibility Verification (REV) System or a successor system (rather than through the MEDI or REV or a successor system or directly to the Department of Human Services) within 15 days of the facility receiving required prescreening information. Requires prescreening information to be date stamped by the facility upon receipt. Provides that claims that are not submitted and received in compliance with the foregoing requirements shall not be eligible for payment under the medical assistance program, and the State shall have no liability for payment of those claims with one specified exception. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall waive one or more of the timeframes specified under the Code upon determining that services provided were medically necessary and provided in good faith, that failure to meet one or more of the timeframes was an error on the part of an individual employee, and that the withholding of reimbursement would constitute a financial hardship which would jeopardize the ability of the facility to pay its workers, provide for the basic needs of its residents, and ensure the highest quality of care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-LONG TERM CARE CLAIMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
2017-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
2017-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-19HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-03-02SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback