IL SB1544 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Aid Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the State Finance Act. Creates the Hunger Relief Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that, from appropriations to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services from the Fund, the Department shall make grants to members of the Illinois Food Bank Association for the purpose of making capital improvements, purchasing food, or acquiring other assets. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a tax checkoff for the Hunger Relief Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-GRANTS-HUNGER RELIEF
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. John Millner [R] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0604 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date August 24, 2009 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue | |
2009-05-21 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-21 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 21, 2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-20 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-05-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2009-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-04-17 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-31 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-31 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-31 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009 | |
2009-03-06 | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |