IL SB1542 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Allows participants of a downstate police pension fund to transfer up to 10 years of creditable service to the IMRF and allows participants of IMRF to transfer up to 10 years of creditable service to the a downstate police pension fund. Requires the participant to either pay the difference in contributions or have the creditable service reduced accordingly. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3 & 4 TRANSFERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Pensions and Investments | |
2009-03-06 | Postponed - Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1542&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1542.htm |