IL SB1541 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if the landlord, or his or her agent or attorney, is unable to personally serve the demand on the tenant, then constructive service of the demand may be accomplished. Makes corresponding changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVICTIONS-CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-107Amended CodeCitation Text
73559-211Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback