IL SB1540 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no legislator may negotiate for employment with a lobbying entity that engages in lobbying with members of the General Assembly during the legislator's term of office. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a member may not, within a period of one year immediately after termination of the member's most recent term of office, engage in lobbying with members of the General Assembly, if the member accepts compensation specifically attributable to that lobbying.
Title
ETHICS-MEMBER LOBBYING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 2-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1540&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1540.htm |