IL SB1536 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Renter's Financial Responsibility and Protection Act. Provides that a rental company may void a damage waiver for damage or loss to the rental vehicle if the rental vehicle is stolen and the renter fails to: (i) return the rental vehicle's ignition key and the key tag identifying the rental vehicle to the rental vehicle company; (ii) file a police report within the 24-hour period after discovery of the rental vehicle theft; and (iii) fully cooperate with the rental company, law enforcement agency, or any other authority in all matters connected to the investigation of the stolen rental vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENTAL VEH-DAMAGE WAIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-19SenateDo Pass Insurance; 012-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Insurance
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6252715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback