IL SB1536 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the imposition of term limits by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise must be prospective. Provides that elective office held prior to the effective date of any term limit imposed by a municipality shall not prohibit a person otherwise eligible from running for or holding elective office in that municipality. Provides that term limits imposed in a manner inconsistent with the applicable provisions remain valid prospectively, but are invalid as they apply to service prior to the enactment of the term limits. Provides that imposition of term limits by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise shall only apply to terms for the same office or that category of municipal office. Provides that these provisions apply to all term limits imposed by a municipality by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise passed on or after November 8, 2016. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-MUNICIPAL TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0114 |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective Date July 19, 2019 |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-016-001 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-002-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-019-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Verified |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-005-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |