IL SB1532 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Reduction of Lead Service Lines Act. Requires community water supplies to identify and replace all lead service lines that connect to a water main. Provides that every community water supply in Illinois that has known lead service lines shall create a plan, to be submitted to the Environmental Protection Agency for approval, to replace all lead service lines and galvanized service lines if the service line is or was connected to lead piping. Provides that, within legal bounds, a community water supply shall have the authority to access private property and private residences for the sole purpose of identifying or replacing lead service lines or galvanized service lines. Provides that no person shall replace a portion of a lead service line without replacing the entirety of the line at the same time, except in cases of emergency repair. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish a comprehensive low-income water assistance policy and program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Removes references to unaccounted-for water and replaces them with references to nonrevenue water. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may allow or direct a water utility to establish a customer assistance program. Provides that certain entities that serve or provide water or sewer services shall prepare a summary of the cost of service for a given calendar year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEAD SERVICE LINE REPLACEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-870New CodeSee Bill Text
22058-306Amended CodeCitation Text
415517.11Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback