IL SB1532 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the compulsory school age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL REPORT CARD-ATTENDANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Collins
2017-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback