IL SB1531 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Abolishes the Real Estate Education Advisory Council. Transfers functions of the Council to the Real Estate Administration and Disciplinary Board or the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Allows the Department to make continuing education requirements for licensed leasing agents without the advice of the Advisory Council and Board. Makes changes to the membership and terms of the Board. Allows the Secretary of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to establish temporary or permanent committees of the Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE APPRAISER-BOARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-07-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 To Gaming Subcommittee
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-06-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-06-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254541-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545425-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-10Repealed CodeCitation Text
22545430-15Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-27Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-85Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback