IL SB1530 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity is authorized to receive and approve applications for the designation of "High Impact Businesses" in Illinois if the business intends to, among other other potential intentions, establish a new utility-scale solar facility at a designated location in Illinois. Changes references of "Wind Energy Business" to "Renewable Energy Business". Defines "new utility-scale solar facility". Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-HIGH IMPACT BUSINESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-001-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206555.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback