IL SB1529 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. In provisions requiring the Illinois Power Agency to solicit 15-year contracts for delivery of renewable energy credits from new utility-scale wind projects, new utility-scale solar projects, and brownfield site photovoltaic projects to begin delivery on June 1, 2019, if available, but not later than June 1, 2021, specifies that, if the project has delays in the establishment of an operating interconnection with the applicable transmission or distribution system as a result of the actions or inactions of the transmission or distribution provider, or other causes for force majeure as outlined in the procurement contract, delivery shall begin not later than June 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL POWER AGENCY-CONTRACTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0113
2019-07-19SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-19SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-27HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-27HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 017-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 017-000-001
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2038551-75Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback