IL SB1529 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Farm Nuisance Suit Act. To the definition of "farm", adds land used for the keeping of livestock, horse keeping, and horse boarding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FARM NUISANCE-HORSES&LIVESTOCK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0447
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-001
2017-04-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
740702Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback