IL SB1526 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago, Illinois Community College District No. 508, at the general primary election in 2022 on a nonpartisan ballot. Provides that a member of the board of trustees shall be elected at each consolidated election thereafter. Makes related changes. Amends the Public Community College Act. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Provides that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the trustee districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-24SenateTo Executive- Elections
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-52Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2.1New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.3New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback