IL SB1525 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services, subject to appropriations, to provide eligible youth an apprenticeship stipend to cover those costs associated with entering an apprenticeship, including, but not limited to fees, tuition for classes, work clothes, rain gear, boots, and occupation-specific tools. Provide that the following youth shall be eligible for an apprenticeship stipend: youth for whom the Department has court-ordered legal responsibility; youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older; or youth formerly under care who have been adopted and were the subject of an adoption assistance agreement or who have been placed in private guardianship and were the subject of a subsidized guardianship agreement. Limits the stipend to eligible youth who: (i) are enrolled in an approved apprenticeship training program; (ii) are not a recipient of any other scholarship or fee waiver provided by the Department; and (iii) are under the age of 26. Provides that apprenticeship stipends shall be available to an eligible youth for a maximum of 5 years after the youth enrolls in a qualifying apprenticeship program. Waives the age requirement and 5-year cap on the stipend for applicants who were unable to enroll in a qualifying apprenticeship program because the applicant: (i) was called into active duty with the United States Armed Forces; (ii) was deployed for service in the United States Public Health Service Commissioned Corps; or (iii) volunteered in the Peace Corps or the AmeriCorps. Requires the Department to develop outreach programs to ensure qualifying youths are aware of the availability of the apprenticeship stipends. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-APPRENTICESHIP STIPENDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0558
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-07HouseRe-Referred to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1525&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0558.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1525ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1525_04042019_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1525_05272019_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1525ham002_05312019_078000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback