IL SB1523 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that physical education may (rather than shall) be provided to pupils. Makes related changes, including changes concerning physical fitness assessments. Removes a provision concerning the State Board of Education preparing and making available guidelines for the various grades and types of schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PHYSICAL EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105527-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-6.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback