IL SB1522 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to develop, by rule, a process by which a facility experiencing cash flow problems can request a hardship payment from a managed care organization as an advance against money owed to the facility by the managed care organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-MANAGED CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-02SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555F-33Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback