IL SB1518 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that, in a case regarding temporary guardianship, if no limited or plenary guardian has been appointed in a case regarding temporary guardianship, the court may grant an extension up to an additional 60 days or until a limited or plenary guardian has been appointed. Provides that the court may appoint separate individuals or entities or co-guardians to act as the guardian of the person and the guardian of the estate of a person with a disability under certain circumstances. Provides that a guardian is entitled to reasonable and appropriate fees, if certain conditions are met. Provides that fees awarded to a guardian shall be considered as a first-class claim for administrative expenses and paid from the guardianship estate from the decedent's estate. Adds procedures regarding the succession of a new Public Guardian. Makes formatting changes in Sections concerning: definitions; statutory forms; short-term guardians; preliminary hearings; domestic violence orders of protection; sterilization of the ward; and notice of rights of the ward. Changes references to "best interest" to "best interests". Amends the Illinois Power of Attorney Act. Provides that if an agent seeks guardianship of the principal, the petition for guardianship must delineate the specific powers to be granted to the guardian that are not already included in the power of attorney.
Title
PROBATE ACT-ADULT GUARDIANSHIP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Held in Judiciary |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-25 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 45 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-17.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-18.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 13-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 18-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 19-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 25-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 27-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |